OR SJR42 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to provide that every legislative measure must be introduced at request of Senator or Representative. Prohibits committees from introducing legislative measures. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to introduction of legislative measures.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Dennis Linthicum [R] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SJR42 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR42/Introduced |