OR SJR42 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring May 1, 2010, as Future Business Leaders of America day in Oregon.
Title
Declaring May 1, 2010, as Future Business Leaders of America day in Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Sustainability and Economic Development. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-15 | Final reading. Carried by Schrader. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2010-02-12 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2010-02-10 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Business and Transportation. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/10ss1/measures/sjr1.dir/sjr0042.intro.html |