OR SJR41 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to sessions of the Legislative Assembly.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to sessions of the Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Read. Carried by Roblan. Readopted. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 1--Schaufler. | |
2010-02-25 | House adopted Conference Committee Report. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 1--Schaufler. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate adopted Conference Committee Report and readopted resolution. Ayes, 19; nays, 9--Atkinson, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Morse, Starr, Telfer, Whitsett; excused, 2--Bates, George. | |
2010-02-25 | Conference Committee Report read in House. | |
2010-02-25 | Conference Committee Recommendation: The Senate concur in House amendments dated 02-23 and B-Engrossed resolution be further amended and readopted. | |
2010-02-25 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-24 | Representatives Berger, Garrett, Roblan appointed House conferees No 2. | |
2010-02-24 | Senators Atkinson, Devlin, Rosenbaum appointed Senate conferees No. 2. | |
2010-02-24 | Conference Committee Recommendation: Read in House. | |
2010-02-24 | Conference Committee Recommendation: Failure to agree and request conferees be discharged. | |
2010-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-24 | Representatives Berger, Garrett, Roblan appointed House conferees. | |
2010-02-24 | Senators Atkinson, Devlin, Rosenbaum appointed Senate conferees. | |
2010-02-24 | Rules suspended. Motion to refuse to concur in House amendments carried by voice vote. | |
2010-02-24 | Adopted. Ayes, 34; Nays, 24--Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Riley, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-24 | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 33--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Beyer, Boone, Buckley, Cannon, Clem, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Edwards, Frederick, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Komp, Kotek, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Riley, Roblan, Smith J., Stiegler, Tomei, VanOrman, Witt, Speaker Hunt; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-18 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-17 | Final reading. Carried by Devlin, Atkinson. Adopted. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Whitsett. | |
2010-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-15 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |