OR SJR34 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to establish Independent Public Service Compensation Commission. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to establish Independent Public Service Compensation Commission. Provides that specified individuals are ineligible for membership on commission. Directs commission to establish salaries for specified public officials. Provides that moneys sufficient to pay for salaries are appropriated from General Fund upon commission's adoption of its determinations. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to public official compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-24 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments to the A-Eng measure. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-06SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2023-07-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-25SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Knopp.
2023-06-25SenateRules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and readopted Resolution. Ayes, 21; Nays, 4--Bonham, Girod, Robinson, Smith DB; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher.
2023-06-24HouseRules suspended. Read. Carried by Valderrama. Adopted. Ayes, 47; Nays, 3--Boshart Davis, Cate, Scharf; Excused, 10--Conrad, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Morgan, Nguyen H, Owens, Reschke, Smith G, Wright.
2023-06-24HouseRecommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2023-06-23HouseWork Session held.
2023-06-23HouseMotion to rerefer to Rules carried. Rereferred.
2023-06-23HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2023-06-22HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-06-21HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-06-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-21SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Knopp.
2023-06-21SenateRules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Knopp, Lieber. Adopted. Ayes, 21; Nays, 4--Bonham, Girod, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-21SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-20SenateRecommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-06-16SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-06-16SenateReferred to Rules.
2023-06-15SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SJR34
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR34/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR34/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR34/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR34/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR34/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR34/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25413
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25489
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25490
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276125
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276126
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276131
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276135
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80555
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80556
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80584
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80623
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80846
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80939
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276413
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81004
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81005
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81006
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276485
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276486
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81070
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276659
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36126
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=588211
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36324
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36354
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=590399
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=590578

Bill Comments

feedback