OR SJR25 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to establish Oregon Budget Reserve Fund. Directs Legislative Assembly, in budgeting for biennium, to leave unappropriated three percent of estimated General Fund moneys for biennium. Specifies that if actual amount of General Fund moneys received for biennium equals or exceeds estimate, amount left unappropriated is deposited in Oregon Budget Reserve Fund. Specifies that if actual amount received is less than estimate but not less than 97 percent of estimate, amount by which actual amount exceeds 97 percent of estimate is deposited in Oregon Budget Reserve Fund. Specifies conditions under which moneys in fund may be spent. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to the Oregon Budget Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Rules failed.Ayes, 10; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Boquist, Olsen. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SJR25 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR25/Introduced |