OR SJR23 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution that establishes Personal Investment in Education Fund in State Treasury and directs that moneys determined to be excess revenues under excess revenue "kicker" process be deposited in fund rather than refunded to personal income taxpayers. Dedicates moneys in fund to support kindergarten through grade 12 education with priority given to seismic rehabilitation grant program and student behavioral health counseling. Requires three-fifths majority vote of members of each house of Legislative Assembly for appropriation of moneys in fund. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at special election held on same date as next primary election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to use of excess revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Rules. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SJR23 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR23/Introduced |