OR SJR14 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution providing that surpluses of personal income tax revenues in excess of two percent of forecast revenues are equally deposited in reserve fund established by law and returned to personal income taxpayers. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to state finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SJR14 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR14/Introduced |