OR SJR10 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Senate concurred in House amendments and readopted Resolution. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to prohibit slavery and involuntary servitude in all circumstances. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to prohibit slavery and involuntary servitude in all circumstances. Authorizes court or probation or parole agency to order convicted person to engage in education, counseling, treatment, community service or other alternative to incarceration. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to slavery and involuntary servitude.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and readopted Resolution. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22HouseRead. Carried by Dexter. Adopted. Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Bonham, Cate, Levy, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans.
2021-06-22HousePotential conflict(s) of interest declared by Moore-Green.
2021-06-21HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2021-06-18HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-06-01HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2021-06-01HouseRecommendation: Be adopted with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
2021-05-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-20HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-16HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-15SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-04-15SenateFinal reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Boquist, Heard; Excused, 1--Linthicum.
2021-04-14SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-14SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2021-03-31SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-24SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SJR10
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR10/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR10/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR10/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR10/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31684
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=515905
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32645
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33021
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532723
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533339

Bill Comments 750

feedback