OR SJM4 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urges Congress to enact legislation to begin process of implementing reparations for African Americans based on slavery and discrimination. Urges Congress to enact legislation to begin process of implementing reparations for African Americans based on slavery and discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to enact legislation to begin process of implementing reparations for African Americans based on slavery and discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseRead. Carried by Bynum. Adopted. Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith Warner.
2021-06-01HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2021-05-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-20HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-16HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-15SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Golden, Heard, Kennemer.
2021-04-15SenateFinal reading. Carried by Frederick. Adopted. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Linthicum.
2021-04-14SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-14SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2021-03-31SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback