OR SJM10 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-10)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-10)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to transfer management of Oregon and California Railroad grant lands to newly established board of trustees consisting of representatives from local government, environmental organizations and timber industry.
Title
Urging Congress to transfer management of Oregon and California Railroad grant lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |