OR SCR8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

In memoriam: Robert Bromley Valade, 1941-2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Robert Bromley Valade.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2019-04-17HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-16SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-15HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Mitchell. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, McLane.
2019-04-15HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 15, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-11HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-03-04SenateFinal reading. Carried by Johnson. Adopted. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Hass, Heard, President Courtney, Wagner.
2019-02-28SenateSecond reading.
2019-02-28SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-02-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback