OR SCR8 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Blaine Whipple, 1930-2015.
Title
In memoriam: Blaine Whipple, 1930-2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-29 | House | Read. Carried by Lively. Adopted.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Barton, Gallegos, Heard, Piluso, Weidner. |
2015-05-27 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2015-03-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |