OR SCR6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Mill City Rural Fire Protection District and other first responders for their heroic actions in fighting Santiam Fire. Commends Mill City Rural Fire Protection District and other first responders for their heroic actions in fighting Santiam Fire.
Title
Commending Mill City Rural Fire Protection District and other first responders for their heroic actions in fighting Santiam Fire.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted and requesting referral to Rules (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted and be referred to Rules. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |