OR SCR29 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
Pending: House Veterans and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Sheriff Glenn A. Shipman (1927-2016) for his service to his nation, state and community. Recognizes and honors _____ for his service to his country] Sheriff Glenn A. Shipman (1927-2016) for his service to his nation, state and community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Sheriff Glenn A. Shipman for his service to his nation, state and community.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-04-10HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-09SenateFinal reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Hansell.
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-05SenateRecommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-03SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-03-21SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback