OR SCR24 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
Pending: House Veterans and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

In memoriam: Lewis Linn McArthur, 1917-2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Lewis Linn McArthur.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-04-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-11SenateFinal reading. Carried by Johnson. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Bentz.
2019-03-28SenateTaken from 03-28 Calendar and placed on 04-11 Calendar on voice vote.
2019-03-26SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-26SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-03-20SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-13SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-20SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-02-19SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback