OR SCR211 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adjourns sine die 2020 special session of Eightieth Legislative Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjourning sine die the 2020 special session of the Eightieth Legislative Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2020-07-07SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2020-07-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Read. Carried by Holvey. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barker, Barreto, Clem, McKeown.
2020-06-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Wagner. Adopted. Ayes, 24; Excused, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2020-06-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback