OR SCR21 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adjourns organizational session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly. Adjourns organizational session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly. Provides that Eighty-first Legislative Assembly shall convene in regular session on January 19, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjourning organizational session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2021-02-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-02-04SenatePresident signed.
2021-01-11HouseRules suspended. Read. Carried by Smith Warner. Adopted. Ayes, 46; Excused, 14--Clem, Hayden, Hernandez, Leif, McLain, Nathanson, Post, Rayfield, Reschke, Smith G, Wallan, Williams, Witt, Wright.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-01-11SenateUnder provisions of the Report on the Committee on Permanent Organization, read final time. Carried by Riley. Adopted. Ayes, 23; Excused, 6--Boquist, Heard, Johnson, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback