OR SCR21 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates 69th anniversary of Vanport flood and remembers survivors and those who lost their lives.
Title
Commemorating 69th anniversary of Vanport flood and remembering survivors and those who lost their lives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-20 | House | Read. Carried by Speaker Kotek. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Bentz. |
2017-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-06-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-05-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Carried over to 05-30 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |