OR SCR205 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and celebrates Dr. Joe Robertson for his career at Oregon Health and Science University and extends well wishes to him upon his retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing Dr. Joe Robertson for his career at Oregon Health and Science University.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-01HouseRead. Carried by Greenlick, Williamson. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bynum, Speaker Kotek.
2018-02-28HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2018-02-27HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules.
2018-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-22SenateFinal reading. Carried by President Courtney. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-02-21SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-21SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2018-02-20SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Rules.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback