OR SCR20 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 7, 2022, as Action for Peace Day to honor memory of Edward Reginald "Ed" Epley (1937-2021). Designates April 7, 2022, as Action for Peace Day to honor memory of Edward Reginald "Ed" Epley (1937-2021).
Title
Designating April 7, 2022, as Action for Peace Day to honor memory of Edward Reginald "Ed" Epley.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2021-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Read. Carried by Rayfield. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Moore-Green, Nearman. |
2021-06-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2021-06-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-04-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Gelser. Adopted. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Boquist, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Taken from 04-26 Calendar and placed on 04-28 Calendar on voice vote. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |