OR SCR20 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors USS McGinty and its crew for their service to their country.
Title
Recognizing and honoring USS :bit.McGinty:sit. and its crew for their service to their country.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2019-05-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Meek. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-06 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 7, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |