OR SCR2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
Pending: House Veterans and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Corporal Jimmy Erik Floren (1946-1967) for his service to his country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Corporal Jimmy Erik Floren for his service to his country.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-02-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-02-21SenateFinal reading. Carried by Linthicum. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Beyer, Knopp.
2019-02-19SenateSecond reading.
2019-02-19SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-02-13SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback