OR SCR19 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Taken from 03-05 Calendar and placed on 05-14 Calendar on voice vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

In memoriam: Brigadier General James Burdette Thayer, 1922-2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Brigadier General James Burdette Thayer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateTaken from 03-05 Calendar and placed on 05-14 Calendar on voice vote.
2019-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-04SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-01-22SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback