OR SCR18 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Alfreda Bales for her service to Department of Revenue and State of Oregon. Recognizes and honors Alfreda Bales for her service to Department of Revenue and State of Oregon.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Alfreda Bales for her service to Department of Revenue and State of Oregon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2021-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read. Carried by Evans. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. |
2021-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-04-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Patterson. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thomsen. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |