OR SCR16 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

In memoriam: Martin Davis "Marty" Myers, 1952-2020. In memoriam: Martin Davis "Marty" Myers, 1952-2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Martin Davis "Marty" Myers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-04-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-05SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-05SenateFinal reading. Carried by Hansell, Dembrow. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thomsen.
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-01SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2021-03-18SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback