OR SCR14 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Acknowledges 75th anniversary of signing of Executive Order 9066 and injustice, pain and suffering inflicted on Japanese Americans during World War II and recognizes national Day of Remembrance. Acknowledges 75th anniversary of signing of Executive Order 9066 and injustice, pain and suffering inflicted on Japanese Americans during World War II and recognizes national Day of Remembrance.
Title
Acknowledging the 75th anniversary of the signing of Executive Order 9066 and the injustice, pain and suffering inflicted on Japanese Americans during World War II and recognizing national Day of Remembrance.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Rep. Mark Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Senate concur in House Amendments dated 03/13, further amend and repass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Senate concur in House Amendments dated 03/13, further amend and repass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2017-06-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-13 | House | Readopted.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Bentz, McLane; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith Warner. |
2017-06-13 | House | House adopted Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-12 | House | Conference Committee Report read in House. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Conference Committee Report and readopted resolution.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Recommendation: The Senate concur in House amendments dated 03-13 and A-Engrossed resolution be further amended and readopted. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-26 | House | Representatives Clem, Holvey, Johnson appointed House conferees. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senators Burdick, Dembrow, Ferrioli appointed Senate conferees. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Motion to refuse to concur in House amendments carried by voice vote. |
2017-03-28 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Clem. Adopted.Ayes, 60. |
2017-03-14 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 28, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-13 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Dembrow, Ferrioli. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |