OR SB999 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Effective date, March 4, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Effective date, March 4, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to diversion; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to diversion; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Effective date, March 4, 2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Chapter 25, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-04 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-23 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Bailey, Gelser. | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Bailey, Gelser; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Hunt. | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Services. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading. Carried by Boquist, Schrader. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2010-02-11 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Judiciary by prior reference. | |
2010-02-03 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Judiciary by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-02 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Veterans Affairs, then Judiciary. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |