OR SB998 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Effective date, February 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Effective date, February 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to elections; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to elections; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Effective date, February 25, 2010. | |
2010-02-25 | Chapter 9, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-02-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Repassed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 1--Schaufler. | |
2010-02-25 | House adopted Conference Committee Report. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 1--Schaufler. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate adopted Conference Committee Report and repassed bill. Ayes, 18; nays, 10--Atkinson, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Morse, Starr, Telfer, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 2--Bates, George. | |
2010-02-25 | Conference Committee Report read in House. | |
2010-02-25 | Conference Committee Recommendation: The Senate concur in House amendments dated 02-22 and B-Engrossed bill be further amended and repassed. | |
2010-02-25 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-25 | Representatives Berger, Garrett, Roblan appointed House conferees. | |
2010-02-25 | Senators Atkinson, Devlin, Rosenbaum appointed Senate conferees. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate refused to concur in House amendments. Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Bates, Edwards, George, Verger. | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 19--Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Huffman, Kennemer, Krieger, Maurer, Richardson, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Wingard; Excused, 4--Frederick, Kahl, Schaufler, Tomei. | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-18 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by Metsger. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2010-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-15 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |