OR SB994 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person who has taken child into custody to request, prior to releasing child to custody of child's noncustodial parent, Department of Human Services to conduct criminal records check on noncustodial parent and all adults in same home as noncustodial parent.
Title
Relating to juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 631, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 55; Absent, 1--Smith Warner; Excused, 4--Barreto, Clem, Hernandez, Reardon. |
2019-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 26, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |