OR SB991 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Effective date, March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Effective date, March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to respite services for parents; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to respite services for parents; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Effective date, March 10, 2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Chapter 60, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-23 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; absent, 3--Atkinson, Kruse, Nelson. | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading. Carried by VanOrman. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Human Services. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2010-02-11 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |