OR SB990 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts small modular reactors from certain siting restrictions that apply to nuclear-fueled thermal power plants. Requires small modular reactors to be sited in city or county where electors of city or county have approved of small modular reactors being located in city or county. Requires emergency planning zones for small modular reactors to be located in county where electors of county have approved of small modular reactors being located in county. Requires proposed disposal of high-level radioactive waste by small modular reactor to comport with process approved or adopted by United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission.
Title
Relating to small modular reactors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Dembrow, Frederick, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Carried over to 04-26 by unanimous consent. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |