OR SB989 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Travel Information Council to manage roadside rest areas along interstate and state highways. Directs council to develop transition plan with Department of Transportation and State Parks and Recreation Department. Directs council to report to interim committees on transportation about transition plan no later than September 15, 2018. Becomes operative January 2, 2019.
Title
Relating to roadside rest areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Transportation Preservation and Modernization. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Preservation and Modernization by order of the President. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Transportation Preservation and Modernization. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |