OR SB989 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Effective date, March 4, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Effective date, March 4, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to collective bargaining elections for faculty of certain universities; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to collective bargaining elections for faculty of certain universities; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Effective date, March 4, 2010. | |
2010-02-24 | Chapter 22, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-02-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Bruun, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Kennemer, Krieger, Olson, Richardson, Sprenger, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Atkinson, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Starr, Telfer, Whitsett. | |
2010-02-11 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Commerce and Workforce Developmemt. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |