OR SB980 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires manufacturer to compensate manufacturer's franchisee for all labor and parts manufacturer requires franchisees to use to perform repairs on vehicles that are subject to recall. Requires manufacturer to compensate dealer at prorated rate of at least 1.5 percent of valuation of used vehicle that is subject to recall during each month in which dealer holds vehicle for sale while awaiting parts or remedy that is necessary to repair or service vehicle. Specifies conditions for compensation and period during which manufacturer is required to pay compensation. Prohibits manufacturer from reducing compensation that manufacturer owes to franchisee solely because franchisee submitted claim for or received compensation under Act.
Title
Relating to service in connection with recalled motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 363, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | DeBoer declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Prozanski. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Carried over to 04-26 by unanimous consent. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |