OR SB967 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Oregon Health Authority to reimburse coordinated care organizations using payment mechanisms other than global budgets under specified circumstances. Allows Oregon Health Authority to reimburse coordinated care organizations using payment mechanisms other than global budgets under specified circumstances. Replaces Health Plan Quality Metrics Committee and metrics and scoring subcommittee with Health Equity Quality Metrics Committee and modifies duties and functions. Authorizes specified incentives for compliance with quality measures adopted by committee. Eliminates requirement that initial health assessments by coordinated care organizations on children in foster care be performed in accordance with quality metrics established by metrics and scoring subcommittee. Deletes obsolete references to prepaid managed care health services organizations and dental care organizations. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |