OR SB967 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to include in judgment document age of defendant at time of committing offense if defendant sentenced to term of incarceration and physical custody of defendant is related to age of defendant at time of committing crime. Directs Department of Corrections to transfer person sentenced to term of incarceration for offense committed when person was under 18 years of age to physical custody of Oregon Youth Authority even if criminal proceedings were initiated after person attained 18 years of age. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the physical custody of a person sentenced to a term of incarceration; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB967 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB967/Introduced |