OR SB965 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Oregon Health Authority to conduct off-site investigation after receiving certain complaints against hospitals. Allows Oregon Health Authority to conduct off-site investigation after receiving certain complaints against hospitals. Allows initial licensure inspections to be conducted off-site for specified providers of home- and community-based care and hospice care.] Permits authority to disclose information obtained during investigation of complaint or reported violation against home health agency, in-home care agency, hospice program or caregiver registry to specified public entities to carry out regulatory or enforcement activities of such public entities. Allows authority to issue temporary or provisional certification to practice as hemodialysis technician during local, state or federal declaration of state of emergency or public health emergency. Permits certification by reciprocity of hemodialysis technicians. Authorizes authority to require fingerprints for purpose of conducting criminal records check of persons applying for or renewing certification as hemodialysis technicians. Updates defined term from "dialysis facility or center" to "outpatient renal dialysis facility" for purposes of hemodialysis technician statutes. Removes requirement that outlines of instruction for courses for psilocybin service facilitators be submitted to Department of Education. Expands membership of Oregon Public Health Advisory Board and specifies criteria for new members.
Title
Relating to health care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Chapter 199, 2023 Laws. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 21--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 3--Evans, Osborne, Sosa; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2023-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-04-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading. Taken from 04-19 Calendar and placed on 04-25 Calendar. Ayes, 15; Nays, 12--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 3--Findley, Gorsek, Meek. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Carried over to 04-19 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |