OR SB963 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies allowed and prohibited uses of restraint of students by public education programs. Prescribes reporting requirements for use of restraint or seclusion. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to safe classrooms; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateGovernor signed.
2019-05-30HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-30SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-29HouseThird reading. Carried by Helt, Clem. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson.
2019-05-28HouseCarried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-27HouseCarried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-23HouseCarried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-22HouseCarried over to May 23, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-21HouseCarried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-20HouseCarried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-17HouseCarried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-16HouseCarried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2019-05-15HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-05-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-01HouseWork Session cancelled.
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Education.
2019-03-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-03-25SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Bentz, Heard, Johnson, Winters.
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-03-18SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Education.
2019-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback