OR SB96 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Liquor Control Commission to regulate testing and labeling of inhalant delivery systems that include industrial hemp-derived vapor items. Defines "cannabinoids" for purpose of inhalant delivery systems. Authorizes Oregon Health Authority to consult with Oregon Liquor Control Commission on adoption of rules related to inhalant delivery systems containing cannabinoids.] Authorizes Oregon Liquor Control Commission to regulate testing and labeling of inhalant delivery systems that contain cannabinoids derived from industrial hemp] include industrial hemp-derived vapor items. Defines "industrial hemp-derived vapor item." Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to cannabis; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 646, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith Warner, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Johnson, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |