OR SB958 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires State of Oregon to contribute 50 percent match for every private donation of $10,000 or more made to Oregon State University Foundation for express purpose of supporting agricultural research with emphasis on cereal grains, to extent moneys are available. Requires State of Oregon to contribute 50 percent match for every private donation of $10,000 or more made to Oregon State University Foundation for express purpose of supporting agricultural research with emphasis on cereal grains, to extent moneys are available. Appropriates moneys to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for allocation to Oregon State University Foundation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to agricultural research.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-06SenateReferred to Natural Resources by order of the President, then Ways and Means by prior referrence.
2023-03-06SenateRecommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Natural Resources, then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-03-02SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-23SenateReferred to Energy and Environment, then Ways and Means.
2023-02-22SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB958
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB958/Introduced
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75012
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74529
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74957
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75085
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263171
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263170
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263173
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34426

Bill Comments

feedback