OR SB958 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Dreamers Access Program to award student loans to eligible students with demonstrated financial need. Establishes maximum loan limits for undergraduate and graduate students. Provides that maximum amount of loan per student may not exceed $10,000 per academic year or aggregate total of $50,000.] Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to administer program by rule. Establishes Dreamers Access Program Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys to commission for purpose of awarding loans and administering program. Requires commission to file annual] biennial report with Legislative Assembly stating mean and median dollar amount] amounts of each loan awarded under program and number of students who received loan] loans under program during previous biennium academic year], total number of students who received loan during previous biennium, total amount of moneys within fund, total amount of moneys appropriated or otherwise provided to fund during current biennium by Legislative Assembly and commission's annual administrative costs for administering program. Requires commission to file annual report with Legislative Assembly stating total amount of moneys within fund, total amount of moneys appropriated or otherwise provided to fund during current biennium by Legislative Assembly and commission's annual administrative costs for administering program.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to student loans; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Wagner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |