OR SB955 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Effective date, July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Effective date, July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to support implementation of AgriStress Helpline in Oregon. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to support implementation of AgriStress Helpline in Oregon. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to providing for mental health needs of the agricultural workforce; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Hai Pham [D] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] |
Sen. Kayse Jama [D] | Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] | Rep. James Hieb [R] |
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-01 | Senate | Effective date, July 18, 2023. |
2023-08-01 | Senate | Chapter 373, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Levy B. Passed. Ayes, 50; Excused, 9--Conrad, Diehl, Elmer, Javadi, Morgan, Nguyen H, Osborne, Reschke, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Helfrich. |
2023-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2023-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-25 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp, Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and request referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |