OR SB949 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for purposes of prison education programs. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |