OR SB941 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to Curry Health District for emergency room in Curry Medical Center. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to Curry Health District for purposes of acquiring ambulance for maternity care and opening] emergency room in Curry Medical Center. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to appropriations for the benefit of Curry Health District; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |