OR SB940 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Education to conduct study to identify improved processes for transferring high school credits earned by student outside United States. Requires Department of Education to conduct study to identify improved processes for transferring high school credits earned by student outside United States. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to high school credits earned outside the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateEffective date, January 1, 2024.
2023-06-14SenateChapter 168, 2023 Laws.
2023-06-06SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-25SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-23HouseThird reading. Carried by Wright. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 1--Reschke; Excused, 1--Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Boshart Davis, Lewis, Morgan, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-22HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-18HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-16HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-30HouseReferred to Education.
2023-03-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-03-28SenateVote explanation filed by Robinson.
2023-03-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-03-27SenateCarried over to 03-28 by unanimous consent.
2023-03-23SenateSecond reading.
2023-03-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-03-21SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-23SenateReferred to Education.
2023-02-21SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB940
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB940/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB940/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76118
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74470
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75807
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76159
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266664
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265101
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266291
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266292
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265876
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271470
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271891
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272309
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272317
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272318
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79028
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34726
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=568105
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35515
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=581376

Bill Comments

feedback