OR SB940 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes portion of revenue received from federal forest reserves when calculating Local Revenues for purpose of State School Fund distributions. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the calculation of Local Revenues for the purpose of State School Fund distributions; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by Order of the President, with a subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Housing. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |