OR SB939 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows additional estate tax exclusion. Allows additional estate tax exclusion. Adjusts for inflation. Allows additional exclusion in lieu of election by predeceased spouse to claim deduction for special marital property. Applies to estates of decedents dying on or after January 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to exclusions from estate tax; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue, then Tax Expenditures.
2023-02-21SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback