OR SB936 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants to developers of single-family homes made available for affordable homeownership. Requires Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants to developers of single-family homes made available for affordable homeownership. Requires department to provide loans under modified version of Affordable Housing Land Acquisition Revolving Loan Program for land for affordable homeownership housing. Requires department to award grants to support innovative homeownership projects. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for purposes of Act. Sunsets January 2, 2026. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to homeownership; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-13SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Housing and Development, then Ways and Means.
2023-02-21SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback