OR SB934 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands exemption from limitations on employment of retired members of Public Employees Retirement System employed by certain law enforcement and correctional agencies. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to reemployment of retired members of the Public Employees Retirement System; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Workforce, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |