OR SB932 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Environmental Quality to contract with independent third-party entity to provide technical assistance to municipalities on matters related to state and federal wastewater permitting requirements. Appropriates moneys to department to carry out purposes of Act. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to technical assistance for wastewater permitting; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB932 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/Introduced |